Koppert, George John (CPSO#: 31947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
410 Giles Boulevard East
Windsor ON  N9A 4C6
Phone: (519) 256-1823
Fax: (519) 254-3849
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Koppert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Koppert ( CPSO# 31947 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Business Address:
Windsor Regional - Met Site
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional -Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE JOHN KOPPERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPPERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1980