Koppikar, Sahil (CPSO#: 103051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Adult Rheumatology
399 Bathrurst St
Room 1E-452
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAHIL KOPPIKAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KOPPIKAR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. KOPPIKAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOPPIKAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KOPPIKAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KOPPIKAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KOPPIKAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018