Kopplin, Peter Arthur (CPSO#: 21962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
602 Melita Crescent
Toronto ON  M6G 3Z5
Phone: (416) 530-4482
Fax: 416 530-1686
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Virtual Ward
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON M5S 1B1
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6363
Fax: 416 323-6107
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ARTHUR KOPPLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPPLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1969