Koprowicz, Kinga Tatiana (CPSO#: 67967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1699 Kirkfield Road
Kirkfield ON  K0M 2B0
Phone: (705) 438-3189
Fax: (705) 438-5174
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Canadian Centre For Integrative Med
12 Main St N
Markham ON  L3P 1X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 471-9355
Fax: (905) 471-4348
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Koprowicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Koprowicz ( CPSO# 67967 )

Business Address:
1699 Kirkfield Road
Kirkfield ON  K0M 2B0
Phone Number: (705) 348-3189

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 25, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kinga Tatiana
            Koprowicz, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Koprowicz
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. KINGA TATIANA KOPROWICZ
                                          ("Dr. Koprowicz")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".                                                
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, certificate of registration number 67967, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214751 (the "Investigation") into my prescribing
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic
                  Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                  (i)   the date of the appointment;
                  (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                  (iv)  the clinical indication;
                  (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or different
                        dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N); 
                  (vi)  Dr. Koprowicz's signature;
                  (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable, as set
                        out                                                          
                        below); and
                  (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set out
                        below).
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write
                  for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored
                  Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.

            (7)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of twelve (12) months on the terms
                        set out below (the "Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of
                        Clinical Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon
                        recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the
                        College.
                  
                  Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of Clinical
                        Supervision for a minimum of six  (6) months on the terms set out
                        below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to meet with my
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) at least once every month to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if there are not 15 patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, then the charts of all patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                              1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                              2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                              3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                    Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                                    patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                                    Narcotic Preparation,
                  
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                              review.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) have reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every  month.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that after a minimum of six  (6)
                        months of Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that
                        I have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in
                        a less highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may recommend to the College that supervision be reduced. 
                  
                  Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")
                  
                  (h)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to engage in Phase 2 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of six (6) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (i)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to meet with my
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) at least once every three months to discuss
                        the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if there are not 15 patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, then the charts of all patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                              1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                              2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                              3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                    Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                                    patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                                    Narcotic Preparation,
                  
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                              review. 
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) have reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every three months.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that after a minimum of six (6)
                        months of Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that
                        I have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice
                        without supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to
                        the College that the Clinical Supervision cease.
                  
                  (m)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                        Supervision will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  (n)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        location approved by the College;
                  
                  (p)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        reports of the medical inspector received November 10, 2015 and
                        dated January, 2017, and concerns that may arise during the period
                        of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (s)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (7)(r) and/or (s)
                        above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (u)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs as a result of section (7)(t) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Schedule "F", including but not limited to, the following elements
                        of professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                        (ii)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
                              3.    CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                    https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids
                              4.    the CPSO Policy "Medical Records":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-Records; 
                  
                        (iii) Enroll in and successfully complete the online module: CAMH
                              Safe and Effective use of Opioids for Chronic Non-cancer Pain
                              Online Course  or the American College of Physicians SAFE
                              Opioid Prescribing Program
                              http://www.camh.ca/en/education/about/AZCourses/Pages/safer_odt.aspx 
                  
                              
                              https://www.acponline.org/meetings-courses/focused-topics/safe-opioid-prescribing-strategies-assessment-fundamentals-education
                  
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (3) above and Schedule "E" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (9)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (9)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP  and
                        NMS consent form(s), attached hereto as Scheduel "G" and Scheduel
                        "H", respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Koprowicz, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Koprowicz failed to maintain the standard of practice of the
                              profession and/or was incompetent in her prescribing of
                              controlled substances, including narcotics.  As a result of
                              the investigation
                  
                              Dr. Koprowicz will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Koprowicz will engage in professional education in the
                              prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.
                  
                              Dr. Koprowicz's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Koprowicz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Koprowicz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Koprowicz, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 25, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. King Tatiana Koprowicz to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 25, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Koprowicz failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in her prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation

Dr. Koprowicz will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Koprowicz will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Dr. Koprowicz’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.