Kopylenko, Eleonora (CPSO#: 58051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mulock-Bayview Medical
Unit 30
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 830-0016
Fax: (905) 830-1852
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eleonor Kopylenko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kopylenko ( CPSO# 58051 )

Business Address:
30 - 16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 830-0016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELEONORA KOPYLENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPYLENKO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988