Korda, Andrew (CPSO#: 26994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1294 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M6M 4R3
Phone: (416) 243-0700
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Korda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Korda ( CPSO# 82936 )
Dr. A. Korda ( CPSO# 26994 )

Business Address:
1294 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M6M 4R3
Phone Number: (416) 243-0700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW KORDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1985