Korda, Ryan Michael (CPSO#: 82936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1294 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M6M 4R3
Phone: (416) 243-0700
Fax: (416) 243-0624
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Park Long Term Care Centre
82 Buttonwood Ave
York ON  M6M 2J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 614-9494
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Ave
York ON  M6M 2J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 243-3600
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Korda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Korda ( CPSO# 82936 )
Dr. A. Korda ( CPSO# 26994 )

Business Address:
1294 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M6M 4R3
Phone Number: (416) 243-0700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN MICHAEL KORDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007