Kordish, Paul Louis (CPSO#: 32308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
K W Urgent Care Clinic
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener ON  N2C 2N9
Phone: (519) 748-2327
Fax: (519) 748-2576
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

123 Pioneer Drive
Unit 102
Kitchener ON  N2P 1K8
Canada
Phone: (519) 895-2172
Fax: (519) 699-4017
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

10 Alpen Grove
Heidelberg ON  N0B 2M1
Canada
Phone: (519) 699-4017
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

751 Victoria St. South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Canada
Phone: (519) 745-2273
Fax: (519) 745-1871
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. L. Kordish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kordish ( CPSO# 32308 )

Business Address:
KW Urgent Care Clinic
385 Fairway Road South
Suite 9
Kitchener ON  N2C 2N9
Phone Number: (519) 748-2327

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL LOUIS KORDISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORDISH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1985