Koren, Gideon (CPSO#: 50992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
27 Hamered St
Tel Aviv 6812509
Israel
Phone: 972-3-5143923 Ext. 62761
Fax: 972-3-5143923

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIDEON KOREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOREN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992