Koritnik, Angela Rebecca (CPSO#: 66555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
700 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 2V9
Phone: (613) 271-7056
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA REBECCA KORITNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORITNIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1998