Koritz, Hans Rutger (CPSO#: 52148)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: Kortiz, Hans Rutger (used until: 18 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swedish

Education:University of Zurich, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jan 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998