Korkidakis, Ann Kathryn (CPSO#: 98364)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Jan 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 26 Dec 2017 to 30 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 31 Dec 2017 to 05 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jan 2018