Korkola, Michael Lorne (CPSO#: 69877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eagle Ridge Professional Centre
Suite 205
500 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Phone: (705) 503-2553
Fax: (705) 503-2552
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael L. Korkola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Korkola ( CPSO# 69877 )

Business Address:
Eagle Ridge Professional Centre
205 - 500 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Phone Number: (705) 503-2553

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LORNE KORKOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORKOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On March 14, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Korkola.