Korman, Helen Shirley (CPSO#: 30821)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: Korman-Miller, Helen Shirley (used until: 10 Aug 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 1164 Mercer Island, WA 98040 USA
Date Received: 13 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 2015