Korman, Irvine Allen (CPSO#: 15314)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 19 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1955
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Oct 1990

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Jul 1990
Summary:

 In July 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Korman guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he made a misrepresentation respecting a 
 remedy, treatment or device, contrary to s. 27(24); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act 
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 
 27(32).  The Committee also found the Doctor incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the Health 
 Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he demonstrated in his professional care of a patient a 
 lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to 
 an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue practice.  Consequently, the Committee ordered 
 that Dr. Korman's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 04 Jun 1990


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Aug 1988
Summary:

 In August 1988, Dr. Korman pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Korman 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Korman be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence 
 to practice be suspended for a period of sixty days.  The Committee further ruled that Dr. 
 Korman's licence be suspended for an additional twelve months, but that this period of suspension 
 would itself be suspended if the Doctor agreed to complete the McMaster Physician Review Program 
 with special attention to the areas of immunology, allergy and nutrition, and any remedial 
 programs which might be recommended under the Physician Enhancement Program, and if Dr. Korman 
 agreed to an investigation of the kind provided for under s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 
 1980, as amended, within one year of completion of the McMaster programs.  The investigation was 
 to be conducted by investigators appointed by the Registrar into the areas of Dr. Korman's 
 practice in immunology, allergy and nutrition, who would report their findings to the Executive 
 Committee.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Aug 1988