Kormendi, Ferenc (CPSO#: 60203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Debrecen, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frank Kormendi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kormendi ( CPSO# 60203 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 787-7001


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 25 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FERENC KORMENDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORMENDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989