Kornecki, Aleksander (CPSO#: 70735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Mar 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Italian

Education:Universita di Milano, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
P O Box 5375
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55263
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kornecki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kornecki ( CPSO# 70735 )

Business Address:
LHSC
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Aleksander Kornecki may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Paediatrics,  University of Western Ontario, in which
                        Dr. Kornecki holds a geographical  full-time  teaching  or research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements  of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  will  automatically  expire  when Dr.
                  Kornecki no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.