Kornecki, Anat (CPSO#: 78130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Dec 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care London
Dept of Diagnostic Radiology
and Nuclear Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anat Kornecki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kornecki ( CPSO# 78130 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Dept. of Diagnostic Radiology & Nuclear Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
104 - 45 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Anat Kornecki may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Diagnostic Radiology and Nuclear Medicine, University
                        of Western Ontario,  in  which  Dr.  Kornecki  holds a geographical
                        full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research  requirements of
                        her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  will  automatically  expire when  Dr.
                  Kornecki no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.