Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Korol, Kristen Anne (CPSO#: 66547)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2000