Kortbeek, Frank Boudewijn (CPSO#: 65444)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998