Korvemaker, Michelle Leona (CPSO#: 80278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle L. Korvemaker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Korvemaker ( CPSO# 80278 )

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LEONA KORVEMAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORVEMAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2003 to 18 Nov 2003
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2004

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP.

NOTE: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective May 9, 2017.
Download Full Document (PDF)