Korwan, Claudia Angela (CPSO#: 52605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Korwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA ANGELA KORWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1988