Korzeniowski, Martin Arthur (CPSO#: 95051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences
Division of Radiation Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544 - 2 Ext. 4144
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Korzeniowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Korzeniowski ( CPSO# 95051 )

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN ARTHUR KORZENIOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORZENIOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2017