Kos, Antonio Ignacy (CPSO#: 82288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 Fifth Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 5L3
Phone: (705) 264-6888
Fax: (705) 264-6887
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kos ( CPSO# 82288 )

Business Address:
206 Fifth Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 5L3
Phone Number: (705) 264-6888

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO IGNACY KOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2005