Kosalka, Tadeusz Czeslaw (CPSO#: 55006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone: (416) 241-7988
Fax: (416) 241-5528
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Kosalka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kosalka ( CPSO# 55006 )

Business Address:
203 - 2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 241-7988

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 May 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TADEUSZ CZESLAW KOSALKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSALKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1993