Kosar, Stephen Eugene (CPSO#: 33314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2009 Long Lake Road
Suite 404
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 523-4545
Fax: (705) 523-4511
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN EUGENE KOSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1982