Kosaric, Alan (CPSO#: 66398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ophthalmic Consultant Centres
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: (905) 212-1012
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
327 Reynold Street
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Kosaric Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kosaric ( CPSO# 66398 )

Business Address:
Ophthalmic Consultant Centers
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 212-9482

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN KOSARIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSARIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Apr 2008 to 20 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 May 2010 to 15 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995