Koshal, Arvind (CPSO#: 42393)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Ravi Shankar University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2011