Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kosiuk, John Peter (CPSO#: 54749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 34614

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PETER KOSIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSIUK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1987