Kosoy, Martin (CPSO#: 18715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1963

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1963

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
307 Sheppard Avenue West
Willowdale ON  M2N 1N6
Phone: (416) 221-1177
Fax: (416) 225-1588
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN KOSOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSOY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1963