Kostolowski-Kondysar, Malgorzata Hanna (CPSO#: 62833)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Names: Kondysar, Malgorzata Hanna (used until: 07 Mar 1994 )     Kostolowska-Kondysar, Malgorzata Hanna (used until: 09 Feb 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Poland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017