Kostuk, William John (CPSO#: 20548)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre University Hospital Cardiac Investigation Unit P O Box 5339 London ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 15 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017