Kotarba, Delani Dahn (CPSO#: 58194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378 Ext. 622
Fax: (613) 225-9736
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Delani D. Kotarba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kotarba ( CPSO# 58194 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone Number: (613) 686-3378

Business Address:
1473 John Counter Boulevard
Suite 202
Kingston ON  K7M 8Z6
Phone Number: (613) 417-1932

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DELANI DAHN KOTARBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOTARBA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1989