Kotarba, Jan Antoni (CPSO#: 59539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital, Civic Site
1053 Carling Avenue, B4
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4267
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jan Kotarba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kotarba ( CPSO# 59539 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Site
1053 Carling Avenue
B4-SCN
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4418

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAN ANTONI KOTARBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOTARBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Research Fellows - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1990