Kotbi, Owais Khalid I (CPSO#: 113944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  03 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 21 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Room M1472
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8538
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OWAIS KHALID I KOTBI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KOTBI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. KOTBI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOTBI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KOTBI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. KOTBI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. KOTBI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 03 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2017 to 20 Nov 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017