Kothandaraman, Maitreyi (CPSO#: 80906)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2006