Kothari, Jatin Piyushchandra (CPSO#: 75458)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bombay, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003