Kou, Brenda Sharon Hsiao-Mei (CPSO#: 66527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 850-2416
Fax: (416) 850-2415
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenda Kou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kou ( CPSO# 66527 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 850-2416

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA SHARON HSIAO-MEI KOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1998