Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kouroukis, Chrisostomos (CPSO#: 70001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Hematology Department
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 575-7820
Fax: (905) 575-6340
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chrisostomos Kouroukis & Dr. Pauline Boulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kouroukis ( CPSO# 70001 )
Dr. P. Boulos ( CPSO# 72401 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Hematology Department
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 575-7820

Business Address:
201 - 17 King Street East
Dundas ON  L9H 1B7
Phone Number: (289) 238-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISOSTOMOS KOUROUKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUROUKIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997