Koutsogiannis, Dimitri (CPSO#: 79280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
St Catharines General Site
1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46421
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Koutsogiannis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Koutsogiannis ( CPSO# 79280 )

Business Address:
1200 4th Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIMITRI KOUTSOGIANNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUTSOGIANNIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008