Kouvelos, Kallie Lee (CPSO#: 58360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1450 Clark ave west unit 21
Thornhill ON  L4J7R5
Phone: 2895975514
Fax: 2895975513
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KALLIE LEE KOUVELOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUVELOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1988