Kovacs, Colin Matthew (CPSO#: 52819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
14 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone: (416) 465-3252
Fax: (416) 465-0792
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN MATTHEW KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Mar 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989