Kovacs, Eva (CPSO#: 50997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Sciences,Budapest, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone: (416) 298-0666
Fax: (416) 298-7807
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1985

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: May 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

On May 3, 2017, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required family medicine physician, Dr. Eva Kovacs, to complete a specified continuing education or remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Kovacs to:

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months;

• Complete the University of Toronto’s Medical Record-Keeping Course;

• Provide a written summary of the following policies and Clinical Practice Guidelines with reference to how it is applicable to family medicine:
- CPSO Test Results Management policy #1-11;
- Guidelines for the Ontario Immunization Schedule (Adult only);

• Review the following:
- CPSO Medical Records policy #4-12;
- Flow Sheet resources (i.e. Diabetes Patient Care, Patient Health Questionnaire, Rourke Baby Record, Mini-Mental State Examination, Canadian Cardiovascular Society Framingham Risk Calculator);
- OntarioMD Peer Leader Program;
- Screening Guidelines (i.e. cervical, breast and colon cancer)

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately 6 months following the completion of the education program.