Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kovacs, George James (CPSO#: 65907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Summer street
Halifax NS  B3H 3J3
Phone: (902) 473-2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE JAMES KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Aug 1995
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2008