Kovacs, James Francis (CPSO#: 59751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
720 Guelph Line Suite 104
Burlington ON  L7R 3M8
Phone: (905) 331 7888
Fax: (905) 331 0911
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kovacs ( CPSO# 59751 )
Dr. M. Zamora ( CPSO# 55633 )

Business Address:
802 - 5500 North Service Road
Burlington ON  L7L 6W6
Phone Number: (905) 335-1100


Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Zamora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kovacs ( CPSO# 59751 )
Dr. M. Zamora ( CPSO# 55633 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 844-3281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES FRANCIS KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989