Kovacs, Julie Anne Josephine (CPSO#: 58487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1849 Yonge Street
Suite 801
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 482-4001
Fax: (416) 482-4003
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.A.J. Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kovacs ( CPSO# 58487 )

Business Address:
Suite 801
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 482-4001

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 21 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE JOSEPHINE KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1988