Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kovacs, Lajos Berthelot (CPSO#: 64705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Neonatology
3755 Cote Ste-Catherine Road
Room D-3321.1
Montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-7598
Fax: (514) 340-7566

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAJOS BERTHELOT KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1991