Kovacs, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 57333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioner Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52254
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kovacs ( CPSO# 57333 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8475

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1988