Koval, Donald Campbell (CPSO#: 55666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
389 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-3103
Fax: (613) 476-1604
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Koval Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2014


Corporation Name: Donald Koval Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Koval ( CPSO# 55666 )

Business Address:
4 - 389 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD CAMPBELL KOVAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1986