Kovaleva, Maria (CPSO#: 94350)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tajik State medical University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Kovaleva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2015